**Knowing Our Numbers Class 6 Ex. 1.3**

**Knowing Our Numbers Ncert Class 6 Math Solution Ex.-1.3.**

Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.1

Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.2

**Exercise 1.3**

**Question 1:- ****Estimate each of the following using general rule :**

(a) 730 + 998

(b) 796 – 314

(c) 12,904 + 2,888

(d) 28,292 – 21,496

Make ten more such examples of addition, subtraction and estimation of their outcome.

**Solution 1:-**

(a) 730 + 998

730 Rounding off to = 700 (nearest to hundreds)

998 Rounding off to = 1,000 (nearest to hundreds)

So, 730 + 998 = 700 + 1000 = 1700

(b) 796 – 314

796 Rounding off to = 800 (nearest to hundreds)

314 Rounding off to = 300 (nearest to hundreds)

So, 796 – 314 = 800 – 300 = 500

(c) 12,904 + 2,888

12,904 Rounding off to = 13000 (nearest to thousands)

2,888 Rounding off to = 3000 (nearest to thousands)

So, 12,904 + 2,888 = 13000 + 3000 = 16000

(d) 28,292 – 21,496

28,292 Rounding off to = 28,000 (nearest to thousands)

21,496 Rounding off to = 21,000 (nearest to thousands)

So, 28,292 – 21,496 = 28,000 – 21,000 = 7,000

Example 1: 1201 + 2356 = 1200 + 2400 = 3600

Example 2: 3863 + 6542 = 4000 + 7000 = 11,000

Example 3: 8762 – 3664 = 9,000 – 4,000 = 5,000

Example 4: 4548 – 2956 = 5,000 – 3,000 = 2,000

Example 5: 1937 + 3158 = 2000 + 3,000 = 5,000

Example 6: 3285 – 1689 = 3000 – 2000 = 1,000

Example 7: 8745 + 6223 = 9000 + 6000 = 15,000

Example 8: 1048 – 1038 = 1000 – 1000 = 0

Example 9: 6362 + 5803 = 6,000 + 6,000 = 12,000

Example 10: 9864 – 6358 = 10,000 – 6000 = 4,000

**Question 2 :- ****Give a rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds) and also a closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens) :**

(a) 439 + 334 + 4,317

(b) 1,08,734-47,599

(c) 8,325-491

(d) 4,89,348-48,365

Make four such examples:

**Solution 2:-**

(a) 439 + 334 + 4,317

- The rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds)

439 + 334 + 4,317 = 400 + 300 + 4300 = 5,00 - The closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens)

439 + 334 + 4317 = 440 + 330 + 4320 = 5090.

(b) 1,08,734 – 47,599

- The rough estimate (By rounding off to nearest hundreds)

1,08,734 – 47,599 = 1,08,700 – 47,600 = 61,100 - The closer estimate (By rounding off to nearest tens)

1,08,734 – 47,599 = 1,08,730 – 47,600 = 61,130.

(c) 8325 – 491

- The rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds)

8325 – 491 = 8300 – 500 = 7800 - The closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens)

8325 – 491 = 8330 – 490 = 7840.

(d) 4,89,348 – 48,365

- The rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds)

4,89,348 – 48,365 = 4,89,300 – 48,400 = 4,40,900 - The closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens)

4,89,348 – 48,365 = 4,89,350 – 48,370 = 4,40,980

**Example 1:** 383 + 561

**Solution 1:**

(i) The rough estimate (by Rounding off to nearest hundreds)

383 + 561 = 400 + 600 = 1,000

(ii) The closer estimate (by Rounding off to nearest tens)

383 + 561 = 380 + 560 = 940

**Example 2:** 8766 – 3819

**Solution 2:**

(i) The rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds)

8766 – 3819 = 8800 – 3900 = 4900

(ii) The closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens)

8766 – 3819 = 8770 – 3820 = 4950

**Example 3:** 6654 – 8266

**Solution 3:-**

(i) The rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds)

6654 + 8266 = 6700 + 8300 = 15,000

(ii) The closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens)

6654 + 8266 = 6650 + 8270 = 14920

**Example 4:** 3827 – 1261

**Solution 4:-**

(i) The rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds)

3827 – 1261 = 3800 – 1300 = 2500

(ii) The closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens)

3827 – 1261 = 3830 – 1260 = 2570

**Question 3 :- Estimate the following products using general rule:**

(a) 578 x 161

(b)5281 x 3491

(c) 1291 x 592

(d) 9250 x 29

Make four more such examples.

**Solution:**

(a) 578 x 161 = 600 x 200 = 1,20,000

(b) 5281 x 3491 = 5000 x 3500 = 1,75,00,000

(c) 1291 x 592 = 1300 x 600 = 7,80,000

(d) 9250 x 29 = 9000 x 30 = 2,70,000

**Example 1.** 384 x 1026

**Solution 1:**

384 x 1026 = 400 x 1000 = 4,00,000

**Example 2.** 6812 x 1191

**Solution 2:**

6812 x 1191 = 7000 x 1000 = 70,00,000

**Example 3.** 3888 x 9150

**Solution 3:-**

3888 x 9150 = 4000 x 9000 = 3,60,00,000

**Example 4.** 3005 x 7520

**Solution 4:-**

3005 x 7520 = 3000 x 8000 = 2,40,00,000

Ncert Solution for Class 6 Chapter 1 Knowing Our Number

Knowing Our Numbers

Knowing Our Numbers

Knowing Our Numbers

Knowing Our Numbers

## 2 thoughts on “Free Ncert Class 6 Math Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.3”